House | 06/01/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 6973 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 5137 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5137 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 5137 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 5136 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2757 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 355 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 457 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 457 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 392 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Filed |