Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR47 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Marquez (Senate Sponsor - Shapleigh) H.C.R. No. 47
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 2, 2009;
 May 21, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 International Relations and Trade; May 23, 2009, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.C.R. No. 47 By: Williams


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The Honorable Paul Cruz Moreno, who joined the Texas
 House of Representatives in 1967, retired as the
 second-longest-serving member of that body in January 2009; and
 WHEREAS, This esteemed Texan was born on April 28, 1931, and
 was raised in El Paso; following his high school graduation, he
 enlisted in the Marines and, during his six years in uniform, he
 served with valor in the Korean War, earning numerous awards and
 decorations; he subsequently received a bachelor's degree in
 business administration from Texas Western College and a law degree
 from The University of Texas; and
 WHEREAS, Representative Moreno began his legislative career
 in 1967; long regarded as the "conscience" of the Texas House, he
 pushed for ethics reforms in the 1970s as a member of the "Dirty
 30"; he has also been a tenacious champion of the disadvantaged,
 fighting for single-member districts, seeking to expand access to
 quality education, and calling for the respectful recognition, both
 in rhetoric and in policy, of every individual's human dignity; and
 WHEREAS, Believed to be the longest-serving Mexican American
 lawmaker in the country, Representative Moreno in 1973 joined in
 founding the Mexican American Legislative Caucus, which addresses
 issues of particular concern to Latinos in Texas; moreover, he has
 endeavored to encourage grassroots participation in the political
 process, helping to establish the group Tejano Democrats and giving
 substantial support to the creation of the University Democrats at
 UTEP; and
 WHEREAS, For 40 years, Paul Moreno has devoted his
 considerable talents and abilities to representing the interests of
 his constituents and to advancing the cause of social justice in the
 Lone Star State, and his colleagues have proposed naming a state
 office building in his honor as a fitting tribute; and
 WHEREAS, By this resolution, the presiding officers and
 members of the house and senate express support and consent for
 naming a state office building in El Paso in Representative
 Moreno's honor, and this resolution serves as the authorization
 required by Section 2165.005, Government Code; now, therefore, be
 it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the Honorable Paul Cruz Moreno for his four
 decades of exemplary legislative service and direct the Texas
 Facilities Commission to name the state office building located at
 401 East Franklin Avenue in El Paso the Paul C. Moreno State Office
 Building; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the secretary of state forward an official
 copy of this resolution to the chair and executive director of the
 Texas Facilities Commission.
 * * * * *