E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 05/29/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6040 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4137 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5197 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5986 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5137 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3521 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3521 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3521 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3521 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2725 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2128 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2685 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2685 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Filed |