H.C.R. No. 5 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION WHEREAS, The Texas Legislative Medal of Honor was established to honor gallant and intrepid service by a member of the state or federal military forces, and through his courageous actions in World War II, United States Army Private Pedro Cano distinguished himself as a worthy recipient of this prestigious award; and WHEREAS, Born to Nicholasa Gonzalez Cano and Secundino Cano on July 7, 1920, in Nuevo Leon, Mexico, Pedro Cano moved with his family to Texas as an infant and spent the rest of his life, except for his time in the army, in the Rio Grande Valley; and WHEREAS, After joining the armed forces during World War II, Private Cano was deployed to Europe, where he fought with the 4th Infantry Division; in December 1944, he was advancing with his company near Schevenhutte, Germany, when they came under withering fire from German machine guns; with his comrades pinned down, Private Cano worked his way forward alone, through a hail of fire and over more than 100 yards of heavily mined terrain, until he was within 30 feet of the nearest German emplacement; firing one round with his hand-held rocket launcher, he destroyed the position and killed its two gunners and five supporting riflemen; he then moved on toward a second emplacement, which he attacked with his rifle and hand grenades, killing several more soldiers; and WHEREAS, With another American company nearby similarly immobilized, Private Cano crept to within 15 yards of a third emplacement, killed its two gunners with a rocket, and then destroyed yet another emplacement and killed its gunners, enabling that company to also advance; and WHEREAS, The next day, the Americans once more encountered heavy German resistance, and Private Cano again moved forward alone with his bazooka; crossing open, fire-swept ground, he succeeded in suppressing three more machine-gun positions and killing their gunners, bringing to nearly 30 the number of German soldiers he killed during that two-day period; and WHEREAS, Sometime later, while on patrol, Private Cano and his platoon were surprised by German soldiers, who inflicted heavy casualties; Private Cano lay motionless on the ground until the assailants closed in, then tossed a grenade into their midst, wounding or killing all of them; and WHEREAS, It was in this engagement, or shortly afterward, that Pedro Cano sustained injuries that left him permanently disabled; in addition to a Purple Heart, he was awarded two Silver Stars and a Distinguished Service Cross, the nation's second-highest award for valor; of the more than 16,100,000 individuals who served in the U.S. armed forces during World War II, only 5,059 were recognized with the DSC; and WHEREAS, Mr. Cano's most illustrious medal arrived at his home near Edinburg in the mail, prompting area citizens to plan a formal ceremony, complete with numerous other festivities; on April 26, 1946, Pedro Cano Day, some 4,000 local residents turned out to witness General Jonathan M. Wainwright present the medal to the former private; also present on the dais were other high-ranking American and Mexican military officers, as well as civil officials and several other Rio Grande Valley military heroes; in his remarks, General Wainwright declared that he believed Pedro Cano actually deserved the highest recognition of all, the Medal of Honor; and WHEREAS, In May 1946, Mr. Cano realized a longtime aspiration when he received his American citizenship; six years later, on June 24, 1952, he was killed in a traffic accident; survived by his wife, Herminia Garza Cano, his daughters, Dominga and Maria, and his son, Susano, Pedro Cano was buried with military honors in Edinburg, where today a street and an elementary school both bear his name; and WHEREAS, Pedro Cano repeatedly risked his life to save the lives of his fellow soldiers and to help advance their mission, and for his extraordinary heroism he is most assuredly deserving of this state's supreme military award; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas hereby posthumously confer the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor on Pedro Cano in recognition of his courageous actions in World War II and express to his family its deepest appreciation on behalf of all his fellow Texans; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for Mr. Cano's family as an expression of highest regard by the Texas House of Representatives and Senate. Pea Vaught Turner of Tarrant Maldonado Farias Anderson ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 5 was adopted by the House on May 7, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 5 was adopted by the Senate on May 27, 2009, by a viva-voce vote. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor