E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 05/26/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5164 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2913 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4640 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4819 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4310 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2632 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2632 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2632 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2632 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1934 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1934 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1350 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1676 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1676 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 02/23/2009 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 393 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Filed |