E | 03/12/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 688 | |
E | 03/09/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 631 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 414 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 576 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 614 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 555 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 388 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 388 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 388 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 388 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 385 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 542 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 457 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 393 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Filed |