Senate | 05/21/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2571 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4052 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Record vote | RV#971 | Journal Page: 4051 |
House | 05/19/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4051 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4051 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1148 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 509 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Filed |