E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6980 | |
E | 05/21/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4355 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4355 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4076 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2567 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 461 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 617 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 617 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Filed |