Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HCR83 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 83


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Family and friends of Horace Arnold Durham of Pecan
 Gap were deeply saddened by his passing on January 9, 2009, at the
 age of 74; and
 WHEREAS, Horace Durham was born on January 23, 1934, in New
 Deal; he shared a half-century of marriage with his beloved wife,
 Peggy Jean, and the couple had one daughter, Peggy Lynet, who
 preceded Mr. Durham in death; and
 WHEREAS, A longtime farmer and rancher, Mr. Durham worked
 land in Lubbock County before moving to the Pecan Gap area, where he
 and Mrs. Durham operated their ranch for 40 years; active with the
 programs of the Delta County Farm Bureau, Mr. Durham was the
 recipient of the bureau's 2008 Pioneer Award and further
 contributed to his community as a deacon with First Baptist Church
 and as a member of the Wolfforth Lions Club and Bethel Lodge No. 134
 in Ladonia; and
 WHEREAS, Those fortunate enough to have known Horace Durham
 will remember the way he touched their lives with his kindness and
 generosity, and he will forever hold a treasured place in their
 hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Horace Arnold Durham and extend
 sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his wife, Peggy
 Jean Durham; to his mother-in-law, Coye Reid; to his sister,
 Johnnye Smith, and her husband, Donald; and to his other relatives
 and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Horace Durham.
 Homer
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 83 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 19, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 83 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on March 25, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor