E | 03/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 860 | |
E | 03/18/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 810 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 585 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 760 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 810 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/10/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 461 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 618 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 618 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |