E | 04/03/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1093 | |
E | 04/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1093 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 875 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1065 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1093 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1033 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 821 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 743 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 928 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 928 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 685 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |