E | 04/03/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1093 | |
E | 03/24/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 920 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 661 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 859 | |
House | 03/20/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 860 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 805 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 598 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 522 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 690 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 690 | |
House | 03/16/2009 | Filed |