E
|
06/01/2009
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6027
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6903
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5208
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3617
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3617
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3617
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3617
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3616
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3616
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Refer to s/c on Base Realign Closure by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2240
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3143
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#735
|
Journal Page: 3142
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 3142
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3142
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
House
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|