House | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | RV#549 | Journal Page: 2467 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Failed of adoption | Journal Page: 2467 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Amended | 1-Hartnett | Journal Page: 2466 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2466 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2418 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Record vote | RV#538 | Journal Page: 2418 |
House | 05/04/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2418 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Amended | 1-P. King | Journal Page: 2417 |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2417 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 477 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 477 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Filed |