Senate | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2353 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2353 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2240 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3441 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3146 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | RV#737 | Journal Page: 3145 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 3145 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Amended | 1-Eiland | Journal Page: 3145 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3145 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1930 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 654 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 654 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |