E | 06/01/2009 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 6978 | |
Senate | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4986 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6027 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6903 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5208 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3600 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3600 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3600 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3600 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3600 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3600 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 3600 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 3495 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 2353 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2353 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2240 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3441 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | RV#734 | Journal Page: 3142 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3142 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3142 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 654 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 654 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |