House | 05/29/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1161 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 985 | |
House | 03/27/2009 | Filed |