House | 04/13/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1153 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1153 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1124 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 1011 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Filed |