House | 04/17/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1242 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1242 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1145 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Filed |