H.R. No. 1231 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, April 12, 2009, marks the 68th wedding anniversary of Edgar and Elizabeth Brown of Dallas, and this joyous event provides a fitting opportunity to reflect on their memorable journey together as husband and wife; and WHEREAS, Their first date took place in September 1940, when William Edgar Brown, Jr., escorted the former Zuma Bell Elizabeth Way to the Texas State Fair; the pair had met in 1938, at the ice cream shop in Dallas where Miss Way was employed, and a similarity of experiences and aspirations would help to draw them close together; and WHEREAS, Born on October 8, 1920, in Irving and raised in the farming community of Estelle, Mr. Brown developed an appreciation for education as a young boy and graduated at the age of 15 from Irving High School, having never missed a day of school; he went on to attend what was then North Texas Agricultural College, where he studied electrical engineering; and WHEREAS, A native of Grayson County, Elizabeth Way was born on July 21, 1922, and she grew up, like Mr. Brown, in a large family that was engaged in agriculture; she attended high school in Colbert, Oklahoma, during which time she played on a girls' ball team, and she later moved with her family to Dallas; and WHEREAS, Just before Christmas 1940, Mr. Brown proposed to his sweetheart, and the couple were married in Dallas on April 12, 1941, in the home of the preacher of Hampton Place Church of Christ; after the United States entered World War II, Edgar Brown volunteered for duty with the U.S. Navy, and he worked in the area of radio technology and electronics until his discharge in 1946; following Mr. Brown's return to civilian life, he and Mrs. Brown moved to Dallas, where they raised their three beloved children, Kaye, Gail, and Bill, and established a successful sound-equipment business; and WHEREAS, Sustained and inspired by their deep faith, the Browns are valued members of Cockrell Hill Church of Christ in Dallas; their lives continue to be enriched as well by their close-knit family, which now includes four grandchildren and five great-grandchildren; and WHEREAS, The 68 years of marriage that Mr. and Mrs. Brown have shared is eloquent affirmation of the meaning of love and commitment, and their enduring union is an inspiration to all who know them; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas Legislature hereby congratulate Edgar and Elizabeth Brown on the occasion of their 68th wedding anniversary and extend to them sincere best wishes for continued happiness; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for Mr. and Mrs. Brown as an expression of high regard by the Texas House of Representatives. Harper-Brown ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 1231 was adopted by the House on April 6, 2009, by a non-record vote. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House