House | 04/27/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1664 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1664 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1204 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Filed |