Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR1468 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 1468


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Memories of a life filled with joyful times and
 meaningful accomplishments remain to comfort the family and friends
 of Marvin Wayne Kelley of Austin, who passed away on April 12, 2009,
 at the age of 55; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Cameron on October 31, 1953, to Harmon and
 Shirley Kelley, Wayne Kelley was the youngest of five children;
 growing up he enjoyed a variety of activities, including Little
 League baseball, and attracted many friends with his honesty and
 loyalty; moreover, he taught himself to play the bass guitar on a
 broomstick and formed a band that played throughout Central Texas;
 and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Kelley graduated from C. H. Yoe High School in
 1972 and went on to earn a bachelor's degree in business management
 and economics from Prairie View A&M University; while in college,
 he continued to hone his skills as a musician, and he founded
 another group, Free Expression, that shared a bill with such
 notable acts as Rufus & Chaka Khan, the Commodores, and the Ohio
 Players; his passion for music never waned, and he continued to play
 the bass as a longtime member of the Wesley United Methodist Church
 choir; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Kelley also distinguished himself as a dedicated
 state employee for more than 30 years, during which time he worked
 for the Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, the Department of
 Agriculture, the Texas Natural Resource Conservation Commission,
 the office of the governor, and the Legislative Budget Board, where
 he most recently served as a fiscal notes coordinator; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted family man as well, this esteemed Texan
 married his college sweetheart, Brenda, on December 18, 1976; the
 couple were blessed with two sons, Marlon and Marvin, in whom Mr.
 Kelley took great pride; he coached them in sports for more than a
 decade and shared with them his enthusiasm for the Dallas Cowboys,
 fishing, golf, tennis, cars, and high-tech devices; in addition to
 his career and family responsibilities, Mr. Kelley demonstrated
 concern for his fellow citizens as a board member of the Austin Area
 Urban League; and
 WHEREAS, Wayne Kelley built a life that was rich in love and
 laughter, and although he will be deeply missed, memories of time
 spent in his company will be forever cherished by all those who were
 privileged to know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Marvin Wayne Kelley
 and extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Brenda Kelley; to his sons, Marlon Wayne Kelley and Marvin
 Julian Kelley; to his sister, Constance Kelley Ward, and her
 husband, Clifford; to his brothers, Dr. Harmon W. Kelley and his
 wife, Harriett, Dr. Danny Kelley and his wife, Janice, and David
 Kelley and his wife, Karen; and to his other relatives and many
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Marvin
 Wayne Kelley.
 Homer
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1468 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 30, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House