House | 05/31/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/30/2009 | Record vote | RV#1543 | Journal Page: 6003 |
House | 05/30/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 6003 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 6003 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2292 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Filed |