1 | 1 | | H.R. No. 1591 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, Between the surrender of Japan on September 2, 1945, |
---|
6 | 6 | | and the dissolution of the Soviet Union on December 25-26, 1991, the |
---|
7 | 7 | | world witnessed a period of military, economic, and ideological |
---|
8 | 8 | | confrontation known as the Cold War; and |
---|
9 | 9 | | WHEREAS, Although the Cold War never erupted into a |
---|
10 | 10 | | full-scale armed conflict between the world's superpowers, it gave |
---|
11 | 11 | | impetus to a number of localized hot wars, as well as to a massive |
---|
12 | 12 | | military buildup on the part of both the United States and the |
---|
13 | 13 | | Soviet Union; the consequent demands on U.S. military personnel |
---|
14 | 14 | | were often arduous and dangerous; and |
---|
15 | 15 | | WHEREAS, In the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal |
---|
16 | 16 | | Year 2002, Congress authorized the U.S. Department of Defense to |
---|
17 | 17 | | issue a Cold War Service Medal, to be given to each member of the |
---|
18 | 18 | | U.S. military who served satisfactorily on active duty during the |
---|
19 | 19 | | Cold War era; the DOD has refused, however, to create such an award; |
---|
20 | 20 | | instead, since 1999, the department has made available a Cold War |
---|
21 | 21 | | Recognition Certificate, to be given to those who served during the |
---|
22 | 22 | | Cold War either as a member of the armed forces or as a federal |
---|
23 | 23 | | employee; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | WHEREAS, Cold War veterans believe that this certificate |
---|
25 | 25 | | scarcely suffices to recognize the sacrifices they bore or the |
---|
26 | 26 | | service they rendered; since the certificate was first offered, the |
---|
27 | 27 | | American Legion, VFW, Reserve Officers Association, Combat |
---|
28 | 28 | | Infantrymen's Association, Cold War Veterans Association, and |
---|
29 | 29 | | AMVETS have all expressed the desire that service in the Cold War be |
---|
30 | 30 | | honored with an official medal; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | WHEREAS, A medal that honors service similar to that of Cold |
---|
32 | 32 | | War veterans already exists and, if made available to those |
---|
33 | 33 | | veterans, would both pay them the tribute they are owed and resolve |
---|
34 | 34 | | the Pentagon's concern about the cost of issuing a new award; the |
---|
35 | 35 | | American Defense Service Medal, created by Executive Order 8808, is |
---|
36 | 36 | | given to service personnel who served between September 8, 1939, |
---|
37 | 37 | | following the outbreak of war in Europe, and December 7, 1941, when |
---|
38 | 38 | | Japan bombed Pearl Harbor; as during the Cold War, the U.S. military |
---|
39 | 39 | | spent this period bracing for armed hostilities; and |
---|
40 | 40 | | WHEREAS, A precedent for expanding the dates of eligibility |
---|
41 | 41 | | for the American Defense Service Medal exists with the National |
---|
42 | 42 | | Defense Service Medal; initially awarded for service during the |
---|
43 | 43 | | period of the Korean War, the NDSM was subsequently awarded for |
---|
44 | 44 | | service during the period of the Vietnam War, Desert Shield/Desert |
---|
45 | 45 | | Storm, and the Global War on Terror; and |
---|
46 | 46 | | WHEREAS, The heraldry, order of precedence, and related |
---|
47 | 47 | | issues pertaining to the American Defense Service Medal have |
---|
48 | 48 | | already been settled; the only change in the medal that would be |
---|
49 | 49 | | required would be the removal of the original dates of eligibility, |
---|
50 | 50 | | which are presently engraved on the reverse; removing these dates |
---|
51 | 51 | | will also facilitate the reopening of this award for service during |
---|
52 | 52 | | a similar period of emergency in the future; and |
---|
53 | 53 | | WHEREAS, There is little doubt that Cold War veterans will |
---|
54 | 54 | | prefer to purchase the American Defense Service Medal as opposed to |
---|
55 | 55 | | unofficial commemorative medals, which are not authorized to be |
---|
56 | 56 | | worn on uniforms, thus significantly reducing the cost to the |
---|
57 | 57 | | defense department for providing this award; and |
---|
58 | 58 | | WHEREAS, Those who served in the United States Army, Navy, |
---|
59 | 59 | | Marines, Air Force, and Coast Guard during the years of the Cold War |
---|
60 | 60 | | made an immeasurable contribution to the safety of this country and |
---|
61 | 61 | | its allies, and they are indeed deserving of appropriate |
---|
62 | 62 | | recognition; now, therefore, be it |
---|
63 | 63 | | RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas |
---|
64 | 64 | | Legislature hereby respectfully urge the president of the United |
---|
65 | 65 | | States to modify Executive Order 8808 so as to award the American |
---|
66 | 66 | | Defense Service Medal to United States armed forces personnel who |
---|
67 | 67 | | served on active duty in the period after September 1, 1945, and |
---|
68 | 68 | | before December 27, 1991; and, be it further |
---|
69 | 69 | | RESOLVED, That the chief clerk of the house forward an |
---|
70 | 70 | | official copy of this resolution to the president of the United |
---|
71 | 71 | | States. |
---|
72 | 72 | | Vaught |
---|
73 | 73 | | ______________________________ |
---|
74 | 74 | | Speaker of the House |
---|
75 | 75 | | I certify that H.R. No. 1591 was adopted by the House on May |
---|
76 | 76 | | 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
77 | 77 | | voting. |
---|
78 | 78 | | ______________________________ |
---|
79 | 79 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|