House | 05/08/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2558 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2558 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 2342 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2006 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Filed |