House | 05/19/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3481 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3481 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 3037 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Filed |