House | 06/04/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/31/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 6044 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 6044 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/28/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 5986 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/27/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 3788 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Filed |