House | 05/25/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4227 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4227 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 3942 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Filed |