Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR232 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 232


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A notable career in public service is drawing to a
 close on January 30, 2009, with the retirement of Judy Womack as the
 Mesquite city secretary; and
 WHEREAS, Ms. Womack began her tenure with the City of
 Mesquite in 1984 as a secretary in the city's engineering division,
 where her ability and dedication were quickly recognized; she
 earned a promotion to administrative secretary five years later and
 became assistant city secretary in 1996; and
 WHEREAS, Effective February 1, 2003, Ms. Womack undertook the
 position of city secretary and has served admirably in that
 capacity for six years; skilled in administrative duties, she ably
 coordinated numerous city events such as elections, banquets, and
 Student Government Day; she also succeeded in increasing public
 access to municipal information by posting relevant documents on
 the city's website, and she worked jointly with the city council's
 information technology department to streamline city operations by
 making agenda packets available electronically to members and
 staff; and
 WHEREAS, This diligent Texan has supported her community in
 other ways as well, serving as co-chair of the United Way committee,
 volunteering consistently to help with Christmas in the Park, and
 assisting in the city's relief efforts following Hurricane Katrina;
 her remarkable record of service prompted Mayor John Monaco to
 proclaim January 20, 2009, as Judy Womack Day in the city of
 Mesquite; and
 WHEREAS, In all of her endeavors, Ms. Womack has enjoyed the
 love and support of her husband, Bobby, and their two children, Matt
 and Hillary; following her retirement, she looks forward to
 traveling and spending more time with her family; and
 WHEREAS, Judy Womack has earned the respect and admiration of
 council members and her other colleagues over the course of a
 quarter-century of service to the citizens of Mesquite, and she may
 indeed reflect with pride on a career well spent as she embarks on
 the next exciting chapter of her life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby congratulate Judy Womack on the occasion of her
 retirement as Mesquite city secretary and extend to her sincere
 best wishes for continued success and happiness; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for Ms. Womack as an expression of high regard by the Texas
 House of Representatives.
 Miklos
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 232 was adopted by the House on
 February 9, 2009, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House