Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR2331 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2331


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Words cannot adequately express the heartache felt
 at the loss of U.S. Army Corporal William Troy Warford III of
 Temple, who died on September 5, 2007, at the age of 24; and
 WHEREAS, Assigned to the 1st Cavalry Division, 215th Brigade
 Support Battalion, 3rd Brigade Combat Team, Corporal Warford was
 based at Fort Hood and served as a track vehicle repairer; deployed
 in October 2006, he was mortally wounded in Iraq; and
 WHEREAS, A native of the Lone Star State, Billy Warford was
 born in Marlin on September 13, 1982, to William T. Warford II and
 Jere Lindsay Warford; he went on to marry the former Shea Berry on
 March 25, 2000, in Temple, and he joined the U.S. Army in September
 2004; and
 WHEREAS, Beloved by many, Corporal Warford brought joy into
 the lives of his family and friends; a devoted Catholic, he was also
 a proud Texan and an ardent Longhorn football fan; and
 WHEREAS, Americans owe a profound debt to our nation's
 servicemen and servicewomen, whose love for their country inspires
 them to take up military service, and their dedicated efforts and
 enormous sacrifices are deserving of their fellow citizens' deepest
 respect and gratitude; and
 WHEREAS, Exemplifying the highest ideals of the U.S. armed
 forces, Corporal Warford inspired others with his fortitude,
 tenacity, and courage, and those who knew him will forever hold his
 memory close in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Corporal William Troy
 Warford III and extend sincere sympathy to the members of his
 family: to his wife, Shea Warford; to his children, Anthony and
 Aubrie Anna Warford; to his parents, Jere Warford and William T.
 Warford II; to his sister, Crystal Bethke; and to his other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Corporal
 William Troy Warford III.
 Sheffield
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2331 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 21, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House