Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR2541 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2541


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Hester
 Beck Willis of Waco, who passed away on May 6, 2009, at the age of
 85; and
 WHEREAS, Born on February 1, 1924, in Waco, Hester Beck was
 the only child of Roy and Bessie Beck; she graduated from her
 hometown high school with the Class of 1941, earned bachelor's and
 master's degrees from Baylor University, and went on to teach in the
 La Vega, Dallas, and Waco school systems; and
 WHEREAS, She exchanged the vows of matrimony with John Todd
 Willis, Jr., on February 2, 1952, at a ceremony held at the Austin
 Avenue United Methodist Church in Waco; Mrs. Willis and her husband
 became the proud parents of two children and shared a rewarding
 marriage until his passing; and
 WHEREAS, A life member of United Methodist Women, Mrs. Willis
 served her fellow congregants at Austin Avenue UMC as a member of
 the administrative and stewards' boards and as a Sunday school
 teacher for the Primary I Department and the Friendship Class; this
 engaged citizen was a member of the Sterling C. Robertson Chapter of
 the Daughters of the Republic of Texas, the Henry Downs Chapter of
 the National Society of the Daughters of the American Revolution,
 Chapter BF of the P.E.O. Sisterhood, and the Mary Milam Garden Club,
 and she held a life membership with the Friends of the Waco-McLennan
 County Library; and
 WHEREAS, A kind and caring woman, Hester Willis left an
 indelible impression on the lives of all who shared in her love and
 friendship, and they will forever carry her close in their hearts;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Hester Beck Willis
 and extend sincere condolences to the members of her family: to her
 sons, Dr. T. Bradford Willis and David Parker Willis, Sr., and his
 wife, Carol; to her grandchildren, David Parker Willis, Jr., and
 Laura Anne Willis; and to her other relatives and friends; and, be
 it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Hester Beck
 Willis.
 Dunnam
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2541 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 31, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House