Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR2689 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 2689


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the untimely death
 of Mandy McLane Wilkins of Waxahachie on April 7, 2009, at the age
 of 36; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Corsicana on January 22, 1973, the former
 Mandy McLane was the daughter of William Delano McLane and Mary Ann
 Clark McLane; she graduated in 1991 from Waxahachie High School and
 married Michael Wilkins on December 31, 1995; and
 WHEREAS, Ms. Wilkins attended Bauder Fashion College in
 Arlington and worked in marketing and display at Bealls department
 store; she was a skilled seamstress and, in her leisure, enjoyed
 embroidery and spending time with her dogs; moreover, she took
 great pleasure in the company of her family; and
 WHEREAS, Although she will be deeply missed, Mandy Wilkins
 will long be remembered with great affection and admiration by all
 those who held her dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Mandy McLane Wilkins
 and extend sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her
 husband, Michael Wilkins; to her parents, Del and Mary Ann McLane;
 to her siblings, Devin McLane, Keri McCoy and her husband, Steven,
 and Kristi Floyd and her husband, Todd; to her nephew, Ian Crooks;
 to her niece, Averi Floyd; and to her other relatives and many
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Mandy
 McLane Wilkins.
 Pitts
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2689 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 31, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House