Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR2692 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 2692


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Louis
 Alois Slovak, a lifelong resident of the Ennis area, who passed away
 on March 31, 2009, at the age of 91; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Slovak was born on March 28, 1918, in the
 Creechville Community and attended Village Creek School; called up
 by the United States Army in March 1941, he subsequently served
 three years in the Panama Canal Zone; and
 WHEREAS, While on furlough, Mr. Slovak married Lillian
 Frances Vrana at St. John Nepomucene Catholic Church in Ennis on
 January 3, 1944; the next day, he reported to Camp Maxey for
 training, and in the late summer of 1944, he was deployed with his
 unit, the 32nd Cavalry Reconnaissance Squadron, Mechanized, to the
 European Theater; and
 WHEREAS, On December 16, 1944, Mr. Slovak's squadron received
 the first thrust of the massive German offensive that became known
 as the Battle of the Bulge; as the early fighting raged, Mr. Slovak
 was dispatched on reconnaissance, and on December 17 he and his
 patrol were captured behind German lines; after narrowly escaping
 summary execution, he spent the next four months as a prisoner of
 war; and
 WHEREAS, Liberated at the end of the fighting in Europe, Mr.
 Slovak was honorably discharged as a corporal in August 1945; among
 the numerous military awards conferred on this valiant Texan was
 the Purple Heart; and
 WHEREAS, Following the war, Mr. Slovak farmed in Creechville
 and worked at Leggett and Platt, the Norris Lumber Company, and the
 Pearl Beer Distributing Company; active in the area's Czech
 community, he was a valued member of St. John Nepomucene and the
 KJT, as well as the Disabled American Veterans, the American
 Ex-Prisoners of War, VFW Post No. 7106, and the Catholic Order of
 Foresters; and
 WHEREAS, Louis Slovak exemplified the best values of a
 generation that helped to preserve democracy and liberty at
 tremendous personal cost and that built a stronger, more prosperous
 society, and it is a privilege to honor his memory; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Louis Alois Slovak and
 extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his
 beloved wife of 65 years, Lillian Slovak; to his children and their
 spouses, Danny and Evelyn Slovak, Dolores Sykora, Ronnie and Susan
 Slovak, Michael and Laura Slovak, Timothy Slovak, and Judy Venable;
 to his brother, Bill Slovak and his wife, Mary, and his sister,
 Lillie Honza; to his 13 grandchildren and 10 great-grandchildren;
 and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family, and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Louis Alois
 Slovak.
 Pitts
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2692 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 31, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House