H.R. No. 2692 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Louis Alois Slovak, a lifelong resident of the Ennis area, who passed away on March 31, 2009, at the age of 91; and WHEREAS, Mr. Slovak was born on March 28, 1918, in the Creechville Community and attended Village Creek School; called up by the United States Army in March 1941, he subsequently served three years in the Panama Canal Zone; and WHEREAS, While on furlough, Mr. Slovak married Lillian Frances Vrana at St. John Nepomucene Catholic Church in Ennis on January 3, 1944; the next day, he reported to Camp Maxey for training, and in the late summer of 1944, he was deployed with his unit, the 32nd Cavalry Reconnaissance Squadron, Mechanized, to the European Theater; and WHEREAS, On December 16, 1944, Mr. Slovak's squadron received the first thrust of the massive German offensive that became known as the Battle of the Bulge; as the early fighting raged, Mr. Slovak was dispatched on reconnaissance, and on December 17 he and his patrol were captured behind German lines; after narrowly escaping summary execution, he spent the next four months as a prisoner of war; and WHEREAS, Liberated at the end of the fighting in Europe, Mr. Slovak was honorably discharged as a corporal in August 1945; among the numerous military awards conferred on this valiant Texan was the Purple Heart; and WHEREAS, Following the war, Mr. Slovak farmed in Creechville and worked at Leggett and Platt, the Norris Lumber Company, and the Pearl Beer Distributing Company; active in the area's Czech community, he was a valued member of St. John Nepomucene and the KJT, as well as the Disabled American Veterans, the American Ex-Prisoners of War, VFW Post No. 7106, and the Catholic Order of Foresters; and WHEREAS, Louis Slovak exemplified the best values of a generation that helped to preserve democracy and liberty at tremendous personal cost and that built a stronger, more prosperous society, and it is a privilege to honor his memory; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Louis Alois Slovak and extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his beloved wife of 65 years, Lillian Slovak; to his children and their spouses, Danny and Evelyn Slovak, Dolores Sykora, Ronnie and Susan Slovak, Michael and Laura Slovak, Timothy Slovak, and Judy Venable; to his brother, Bill Slovak and his wife, Mary, and his sister, Lillie Honza; to his 13 grandchildren and 10 great-grandchildren; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for his family, and that when the Texas House of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Louis Alois Slovak. Pitts ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 2692 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on May 31, 2009. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House