1 | 1 | | H.R. No. 2692 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Louis |
---|
6 | 6 | | Alois Slovak, a lifelong resident of the Ennis area, who passed away |
---|
7 | 7 | | on March 31, 2009, at the age of 91; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Slovak was born on March 28, 1918, in the |
---|
9 | 9 | | Creechville Community and attended Village Creek School; called up |
---|
10 | 10 | | by the United States Army in March 1941, he subsequently served |
---|
11 | 11 | | three years in the Panama Canal Zone; and |
---|
12 | 12 | | WHEREAS, While on furlough, Mr. Slovak married Lillian |
---|
13 | 13 | | Frances Vrana at St. John Nepomucene Catholic Church in Ennis on |
---|
14 | 14 | | January 3, 1944; the next day, he reported to Camp Maxey for |
---|
15 | 15 | | training, and in the late summer of 1944, he was deployed with his |
---|
16 | 16 | | unit, the 32nd Cavalry Reconnaissance Squadron, Mechanized, to the |
---|
17 | 17 | | European Theater; and |
---|
18 | 18 | | WHEREAS, On December 16, 1944, Mr. Slovak's squadron received |
---|
19 | 19 | | the first thrust of the massive German offensive that became known |
---|
20 | 20 | | as the Battle of the Bulge; as the early fighting raged, Mr. Slovak |
---|
21 | 21 | | was dispatched on reconnaissance, and on December 17 he and his |
---|
22 | 22 | | patrol were captured behind German lines; after narrowly escaping |
---|
23 | 23 | | summary execution, he spent the next four months as a prisoner of |
---|
24 | 24 | | war; and |
---|
25 | 25 | | WHEREAS, Liberated at the end of the fighting in Europe, Mr. |
---|
26 | 26 | | Slovak was honorably discharged as a corporal in August 1945; among |
---|
27 | 27 | | the numerous military awards conferred on this valiant Texan was |
---|
28 | 28 | | the Purple Heart; and |
---|
29 | 29 | | WHEREAS, Following the war, Mr. Slovak farmed in Creechville |
---|
30 | 30 | | and worked at Leggett and Platt, the Norris Lumber Company, and the |
---|
31 | 31 | | Pearl Beer Distributing Company; active in the area's Czech |
---|
32 | 32 | | community, he was a valued member of St. John Nepomucene and the |
---|
33 | 33 | | KJT, as well as the Disabled American Veterans, the American |
---|
34 | 34 | | Ex-Prisoners of War, VFW Post No. 7106, and the Catholic Order of |
---|
35 | 35 | | Foresters; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | WHEREAS, Louis Slovak exemplified the best values of a |
---|
37 | 37 | | generation that helped to preserve democracy and liberty at |
---|
38 | 38 | | tremendous personal cost and that built a stronger, more prosperous |
---|
39 | 39 | | society, and it is a privilege to honor his memory; now, therefore, |
---|
40 | 40 | | be it |
---|
41 | 41 | | RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas |
---|
42 | 42 | | Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Louis Alois Slovak and |
---|
43 | 43 | | extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his |
---|
44 | 44 | | beloved wife of 65 years, Lillian Slovak; to his children and their |
---|
45 | 45 | | spouses, Danny and Evelyn Slovak, Dolores Sykora, Ronnie and Susan |
---|
46 | 46 | | Slovak, Michael and Laura Slovak, Timothy Slovak, and Judy Venable; |
---|
47 | 47 | | to his brother, Bill Slovak and his wife, Mary, and his sister, |
---|
48 | 48 | | Lillie Honza; to his 13 grandchildren and 10 great-grandchildren; |
---|
49 | 49 | | and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it further |
---|
50 | 50 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
51 | 51 | | prepared for his family, and that when the Texas House of |
---|
52 | 52 | | Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Louis Alois |
---|
53 | 53 | | Slovak. |
---|
54 | 54 | | Pitts |
---|
55 | 55 | | ______________________________ |
---|
56 | 56 | | Speaker of the House |
---|
57 | 57 | | I certify that H.R. No. 2692 was unanimously adopted by a |
---|
58 | 58 | | rising vote of the House on May 31, 2009. |
---|
59 | 59 | | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | 60 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|