Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR3094 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 3094


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Citizens of Socorro lost two beloved residents with
 the passing of Robert Rojas on September 3, 2007, and his wife,
 Francisca Rojas, on November 14, 2008; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Rojas shared 55 years together; they
 were the parents of five children, Gustavo, Osvaldo, Norma,
 Frances, and the late Alonso Rojas, and their family grew to include
 11 grandchildren and a great-granddaughter; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Clint on October 4, 1929, Mrs. Rojas was a
 lifelong resident of Socorro, where she was active in the parish at
 Saints Peter and Paul Catholic Church; Mr. Rojas was retired from a
 notable 29-year career with the Bureau of Reclamation, Department
 of the Interior; dedicated to making his community a better place,
 he had been a member of the board of Socorro ISD for many years; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Rojas set an outstanding example of
 citizenship and family devotion throughout their time on this
 earth, and though they are deeply missed, they will always be
 remembered with love and admiration; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the lives of Robert and Francisca
 Rojas and extend sincere sympathy to the members of their family: to
 their sons, Gustavo and his wife, Anna, and Osvaldo and his wife,
 Cruz; to their daughters, Norma Murphy and her husband, John, and
 Frances M. Rojas; to their grandchildren and great-granddaughter;
 and to their other relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Robert and
 Francisca Rojas.
 Quintanilla
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 3094 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on June 1, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House