Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR311 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 311


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Benito Jurez, who was instrumental in bringing
 sweeping changes to Mexican government and society during the
 mid-19th century, was born on March 21, 1806; and
 WHEREAS, A Zapotec Indian and native of Oaxaca, Sr. Jurez
 was a teenager when he gained the patronage of the family in whose
 home his sister was working as a servant; tutored privately at
 first, he graduated from the Franciscan seminary in Oaxaca in 1827
 and received a law degree from the Institute of Science and Art in
 1834; and
 WHEREAS, Sr. Jurez was attracted to politics at an early age
 and spent virtually all of his adult life either in government or
 waging opposition; he served as a city councilman for Oaxaca from
 1831 to 1833, during which time he strongly supported Indian
 rights, and in the 1840s he served as a civil judge and federal
 deputy; from 1847 to 1852 he held the governorship of Oaxaca; and
 WHEREAS, Driven into exile when Antonio Lpez de Santa Anna
 came to power in 1853, Sr. Jurez joined the successful
 revolutionary movement against him; after Santa Anna himself was
 forced into exile, Sr. Jurez became minister of justice; while
 serving in that post he was responsible for a law that limited the
 jurisdiction of church courts to ecclesiastical cases; and
 WHEREAS, After serving again as governor of Oaxaca, Sr.
 Jurez became minister of the interior in November 1857 and the next
 month took office as chief justice of the Supreme Court; when a
 military coup deposed the government, he declared himself
 president, in accordance with the constitutional line of
 succession, and led the victorious resistance to the usurpers in
 the Reform War of 1858-1861; and
 WHEREAS, Sr. Jurez assumed the presidency officially in
 1861; soon, however, he found himself fighting the French, who
 captured Mexico City in 1863 and set up a puppet regime; once again
 Sr. Jurez and his troops prevailed, with the United States clearly
 favoring their cause, and in 1867 he was again elected president;
 and
 WHEREAS, Plagued with numerous difficulties throughout his
 final term, Sr. Jurez died in office on July 17, 1872; in 1888, the
 city of El Paso del Norte was renamed Ciudad Jurez in his honor;
 and
 WHEREAS, Notwithstanding the difficulties of his final
 years, Benito Jurez remains a towering figure in the history of
 Mexico; he was instrumental in the transfer of political power from
 creoles to mestizos, in asserting the authority of civil law, and in
 preserving the nation's autonomy in the face of foreign invasion,
 and it is a privilege to honor the memory of this national hero;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay special tribute to the life of the esteemed
 Mexican statesman Benito Jurez on March 21, 2009, the 203rd
 anniversary of his birth.
 Alonzo
 Straus Gattis Menendez Straus Gattis Menendez
Straus Gattis Menendez
 Allen Geren Merritt Allen Geren Merritt
Allen Geren Merritt
 Alonzo Giddings Miklos Alonzo Giddings Miklos
Alonzo Giddings Miklos
 Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal
Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal
 Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath
Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath
 Anderson Guillen Moody Anderson Guillen Moody
Anderson Guillen Moody
 Aycock Gutierrez Morrison Aycock Gutierrez Morrison
Aycock Gutierrez Morrison
 Berman Hamilton Naishtat Berman Hamilton Naishtat
Berman Hamilton Naishtat
 Bohac Hancock Oliveira Bohac Hancock Oliveira
Bohac Hancock Oliveira
 Bolton Hardcastle Olivo Bolton Hardcastle Olivo
Bolton Hardcastle Olivo
 Bonnen Harless Orr Bonnen Harless Orr
Bonnen Harless Orr
 Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr. Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr.
Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr.
 Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto
Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto
 Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker
Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker
 Burnam Hernandez Patrick Burnam Hernandez Patrick
Burnam Hernandez Patrick
 Button Herrero Paxton Button Herrero Paxton
Button Herrero Paxton
 Callegari Hilderbran Pea Callegari Hilderbran Pea
Callegari Hilderbran Pea
 Castro Hochberg Phillips Castro Hochberg Phillips
Castro Hochberg Phillips
 Chavez Hodge Pickett Chavez Hodge Pickett
Chavez Hodge Pickett
 Chisum Homer Pierson Chisum Homer Pierson
Chisum Homer Pierson
 Christian Hopson Pitts Christian Hopson Pitts
Christian Hopson Pitts
 Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla
Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla
 Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond
Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond
 Cook Hughes Riddle Cook Hughes Riddle
Cook Hughes Riddle
 Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra
Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra
 Crabb Isett Ritter Crabb Isett Ritter
Crabb Isett Ritter
 Craddick Jackson Rodriguez Craddick Jackson Rodriguez
Craddick Jackson Rodriguez
 Creighton Jones Rose Creighton Jones Rose
Creighton Jones Rose
 Crownover Keffer Sheffield Crownover Keffer Sheffield
Crownover Keffer Sheffield
 Darby Kent Shelton Darby Kent Shelton
Darby Kent Shelton
 Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant
Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant
 Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris
Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris
 Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee
Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee
 Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons
Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons
 Dukes Kolkhorst Strama Dukes Kolkhorst Strama
Dukes Kolkhorst Strama
 Dunnam Kuempel Swinford Dunnam Kuempel Swinford
Dunnam Kuempel Swinford
 Dutton Laubenberg Taylor Dutton Laubenberg Taylor
Dutton Laubenberg Taylor
 Edwards Legler Thibaut Edwards Legler Thibaut
Edwards Legler Thibaut
 Eiland Leibowitz Thompson Eiland Leibowitz Thompson
Eiland Leibowitz Thompson
 Eissler Lewis Truitt Eissler Lewis Truitt
Eissler Lewis Truitt
 Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant
Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant
 England Madden Turner of Harris England Madden Turner of Harris
England Madden Turner of Harris
 Farabee Maldonado Vaught Farabee Maldonado Vaught
Farabee Maldonado Vaught
 Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey
Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey
 Farrar Marquez Villarreal Farrar Marquez Villarreal
Farrar Marquez Villarreal
 Fletcher Martinez Vo Fletcher Martinez Vo
Fletcher Martinez Vo
 Flores Martinez Fischer Walle Flores Martinez Fischer Walle
Flores Martinez Fischer Walle
 Flynn McCall Weber Flynn McCall Weber
Flynn McCall Weber
 Frost McClendon Woolley Frost McClendon Woolley
Frost McClendon Woolley
 Gallego McReynolds Zerwas Gallego McReynolds Zerwas
Gallego McReynolds Zerwas
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 311 was adopted by the House on
 February 26, 2009, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House



Straus Gattis Menendez

Allen Geren Merritt

Alonzo Giddings Miklos

Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal

Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath

Anderson Guillen Moody

Aycock Gutierrez Morrison

Berman Hamilton Naishtat

Bohac Hancock Oliveira

Bolton Hardcastle Olivo

Bonnen Harless Orr

Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr.

Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto

Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker

Burnam Hernandez Patrick

Button Herrero Paxton

Callegari Hilderbran Pea

Castro Hochberg Phillips

Chavez Hodge Pickett

Chisum Homer Pierson

Christian Hopson Pitts

Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla

Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond

Cook Hughes Riddle

Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra

Crabb Isett Ritter

Craddick Jackson Rodriguez

Creighton Jones Rose

Crownover Keffer Sheffield

Darby Kent Shelton

Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant

Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris

Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee

Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons

Dukes Kolkhorst Strama

Dunnam Kuempel Swinford

Dutton Laubenberg Taylor

Edwards Legler Thibaut

Eiland Leibowitz Thompson

Eissler Lewis Truitt

Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant

England Madden Turner of Harris

Farabee Maldonado Vaught

Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey

Farrar Marquez Villarreal

Fletcher Martinez Vo

Flores Martinez Fischer Walle

Flynn McCall Weber

Frost McClendon Woolley

Gallego McReynolds Zerwas