Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR4 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 4


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A rich and generous life drew to a close with the
 death of Dulcenea Maria Munoz of Georgetown on April 19, 2009, at
 the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Munoz was born on July 1, 1921, to Pedro and
 Nicolasa Sotelo Gutierrez in Clovis, New Mexico; she married Juan
 T. Munoz on April 19, 1941, and the couple shared 44 rewarding years
 of matrimony until Mr. Munoz passed away in 1985; and
 WHEREAS, Known as "Nellie" to her loved ones, Mrs. Munoz was a
 caring mother who raised nine children, Josie, Janie, Fran, Gloria,
 Irene, Johnny, and Tony, as well as Julia and James, who preceded
 their mother in death; with the passing years, she had the pleasure
 of welcoming 23 grandchildren and 32 great-grandchildren into the
 family; and
 WHEREAS, Although she is deeply missed, Nellie Munoz leaves
 her loved ones with countless fond memories of happy times spent in
 her company, and she will be forever remembered by those who held
 her dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Dulcenea Maria Munoz
 and extend sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her
 children, Josie Ancira and her husband, Jesse, Janie Bautista and
 her husband, Rudy, Fran Dee, Gloria Woodbury and her husband,
 Brian, Irene Mullins and her husband, Chris, Johnny Munoz and his
 wife, Janie, and Tony Munoz and his wife, Sharon; to her
 grandchildren and great-grandchildren; to her brothers, Blas, Joe,
 and Pedro Gutierrez; to her sister, Virginia Garcia; and to her
 other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Dulcenea
 Maria Munoz.
 Straus
 Martinez Fischer
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 4 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on May 19, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House