Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR593 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 593


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and purposeful life came to an end on
 September 20, 2008, with the passing of Samuel Cavness of Marathon
 at the age of 90; and
 WHEREAS, Born to Will and Dolly Cavness in Mason County on
 June 8, 1918, Sam Cavness answered his nation's call to duty during
 World War II and served as the head of a cavalry unit gun crew in the
 South Pacific theater; for his courageous and dedicated service,
 Mr. Cavness was awarded the Asiatic-Pacific Campaign Medal, the
 Good Conduct Medal, four bronze stars, the Philippine Liberation
 Ribbon with two bronze stars, and the American Defense Service
 Medal; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Cavness earned his living in the ranching
 business throughout his adult life, working on the Dove Mountain
 Ranch for 32 years, at Black Mesa Ranch for 7 years, and on the Guy
 Combs Ranch for 8 years; and
 WHEREAS, He married the former Patsy Ruth Granger on
 September 2, 1946, and the couple were blessed with four sons; they
 also had the privilege of welcoming 12 grandchildren and 9
 great-grandchildren into their family during more than six decades
 of marriage; and
 WHEREAS, Sam Cavness bravely served his nation in a time of
 war and returned home to establish a life filled with joyful times
 and meaningful accomplishments, and he will be fondly remembered by
 all those fortunate enough to know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Samuel Cavness and
 extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife,
 Patsy Cavness; to his sons, Toby, Leo, Sammy and his wife, Dara, and
 Robert and his wife, Paula; to his grandchildren, Amy Hardy, Amber
 Decker, and Buddy, Matt, Cody, Joe, Cal, Chet, Clay, Richard,
 April, and Whittney Cavness; to his great-grandchildren, Caleb
 Decker, Summer and Sterling Hardy, and Madison, Mason, Caden,
 Logan, Carly, and Owen Cavness; and to his other relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Samuel
 Cavness.
 Gallego
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 593 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 5, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House