House | 05/07/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 2682 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 929 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 771 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 610 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Filed |