Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR709 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Coleman H.R. No. 709


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009
 (Recovery Act) was enacted by the Congress and approved by the
 President of the United States on February 17, 2009, to, among other
 things, "preserve and create jobs and promote economic recovery [;]
 assist those most impacted by the recession[; and] invest in
 transportation, environmental protection and other infrastructure
 that will provide long-term economic benefits;" and
 WHEREAS, the Recovery Act provides that its appropriated
 funds shall be used to achieve the Act's purposes "as quickly as
 possible consistent with prudent management;" and
 WHEREAS, Texas is entitled to approximately $2.2 billion in
 funds under the Recovery Act for transportation projects in this
 State, out of which approximately $500 million will be directly
 provided to local authorities; and
 WHEREAS, the Recovery Act directs the State to consider and
 prioritize designated criteria in approving transportation
 construction projects in order to better achieve the overall goals
 of the Act; and
 WHEREAS, Texas has a backlog of transportation
 infrastructure projects to ease the increasing highway congestion,
 both in magnitude and geography, that the State has experienced for
 the past three decades, with traffic delay in the State's urban
 areas increasing more than 500 percent in the last two decades; and
 WHEREAS, the Act allows the Texas Transportation Commission
 (commission) and the Texas Department of Transportation
 (department) 120 days from the date of the President's approval (or
 not earlier than June 17, 2009) to obligate 50 percent of all money
 provided under the Recovery Act to the State for transportation
 projects; and
 WHEREAS, the Act allows the commission and department 365
 days from the date of the President's approval (or not earlier than
 February 17, 2010) to obligate the remaining 50 percent of the money
 provided under the Recovery Act to the State for transportation
 projects; and
 WHEREAS, the commission and the department have testified
 before a committee of the House that the obligation process for the
 first $500 million of the State's total $1.7 billion share of
 Recovery Fund money for transportation was approved on February 26,
 2009, for maintenance related projects, with no consideration of
 the priorities listed in the Act, and without specific information
 by project so that the Legislature and the public could evaluate how
 the projects will maximize job creation and stimulate the Texas
 economy toward achieving the goals of the Act; and
 WHEREAS, the commission and the department have announced
 their intent to begin the obligation process for the remaining $1.2
 billion of the State's share of Recovery Act transportation funds
 for new construction projects on March 5, 2009; and
 WHEREAS, the commission and the department are unable to
 provide the House with sufficient information on the criteria by
 which projects, both maintenance and new construction, were
 selected; and
 WHEREAS, the commission and the department have not been able
 to clearly articulate how each project will spur a growth in jobs,
 how each project will make a meaningful investment in the long-term
 development of the State's transportation infrastructure
 development, or how each project was prioritized to meet the
 requirements of the Recovery Act; and
 WHEREAS, it is exceedingly clear that the commission and
 department are making a rush to judgment in obligating Recovery Act
 money without providing a rational basis for those actions,
 obtaining the advice and input of Members of the Legislature, or
 assuring transparency and accountability in their decision-making
 process;
 WHEREAS, it is the duty of the legislative branch to make all
 necessary provisions for the public good;
 WHEREAS, it is in the public interest to ensure that Recovery
 Act money is used to further the Act's purposes; and
 WHEREAS, the House serves this public interest by providing
 unambiguous direction to the commission and the department before
 the irrevocable obligation of Recovery Act funds; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature:
 (1) urges that the Texas Transportation Commission, the
 executive director of the Texas Department of Transportation, and
 all department employees take no steps to irrevocably obligate any
 Recovery Act funds until the commission and the department can
 articulate a rational basis for the priorities used to select the
 projects for the initial $500 million funding by Recovery Act
 funds.
 (2) requests the commission and the department provide the
 House with a complete explanation of the project selection criteria
 and its practical application, including how the commission and the
 department considered the purposes and criteria of the Recovery
 Act, and specifically including the Act's provisions directing that
 funding priority be given to certain projects, and the data
 concerning which projects most maximize job creation and long-term
 economic stimulus.
 (3) insists that the commission and department act
 prudently in obligating Recovery Act money and in discharging its
 fiduciary responsibilities to the people of Texas with particular
 attention to transparency and accountability in all aspects of the
 selection of projects and the obligation and expenditure of
 Recovery Act funds.
 (4) calls on the commission and the department to allow time
 for meaningful input from elected officials at all levels of State
 government.
 (5) asserts that nothing in this resolution shall be
 construed to authorize the commission or the department to take any
 immediate action obligating Recovery Act funds.