House | 04/27/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1607 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1607 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 769 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/12/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 665 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |