House | 03/26/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 888 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 888 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 686 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |