House | 06/04/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/28/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5178 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5178 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/27/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 856 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Filed |