House | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3476 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3476 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 856 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Filed |