1 | 1 | | H.R. No. 918 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, The dedicated service and immeasurable sacrifice of |
---|
6 | 6 | | our nation's military personnel are being recognized on May 16, |
---|
7 | 7 | | 2009, as Americans observe this country's 59th annual Armed Forces |
---|
8 | 8 | | Day; and |
---|
9 | 9 | | WHEREAS, Before 1950, separate days had been set aside to |
---|
10 | 10 | | honor the branches of the armed forces individually; the |
---|
11 | 11 | | establishment of a single observance followed the combining in 1947 |
---|
12 | 12 | | of the Departments of War and Navy into one entity, the National |
---|
13 | 13 | | Military Establishment, which two years later became known as the |
---|
14 | 14 | | Department of Defense; and |
---|
15 | 15 | | WHEREAS, Members of the army, navy, marines, air force, and |
---|
16 | 16 | | coast guard are justly proud of the heroic records forged by those |
---|
17 | 17 | | branches and by their continuing contributions to the security of |
---|
18 | 18 | | American citizens at home and abroad; and |
---|
19 | 19 | | WHEREAS, The U.S. Army was established on June 14, 1775, when |
---|
20 | 20 | | the Second Continental Congress authorized the formation of 10 |
---|
21 | 21 | | companies of riflemen; from the American Revolution to the present |
---|
22 | 22 | | operations in Afghanistan and Iraq, the army has furnished the |
---|
23 | 23 | | majority of American ground troops when the country has taken up |
---|
24 | 24 | | arms; today this service is composed of a number of basic branches, |
---|
25 | 25 | | including Infantry, Military Intelligence, Aviation, the Corps of |
---|
26 | 26 | | Engineers, and Special Forces, and such special branches as the |
---|
27 | 27 | | Army Medical Department, Chaplains, and Judge Advocate General's |
---|
28 | 28 | | Corps; and |
---|
29 | 29 | | WHEREAS, On October 13, 1775, the Second Continental Congress |
---|
30 | 30 | | called for the fitting out of two warships, thereby founding the |
---|
31 | 31 | | Continental Navy; although disbanded following the conclusion of |
---|
32 | 32 | | the Revolutionary War, this service was reestablished with the |
---|
33 | 33 | | creation of the Department of the Navy on April 30, 1798, and today, |
---|
34 | 34 | | naval personnel ensure the defense of the nation by sea and give |
---|
35 | 35 | | seaborne support to the other military forces; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | WHEREAS, A month after the Continental Congress authorized |
---|
37 | 37 | | the procurement and dispatching of the navy's first ships, it |
---|
38 | 38 | | passed a resolution, on November 10, 1775, calling for the raising |
---|
39 | 39 | | of two marine battalions; the Marine Corps disbanded, like the |
---|
40 | 40 | | navy, following the War of Independence, but it was reestablished |
---|
41 | 41 | | on July 11, 1798; a separate service within the Department of the |
---|
42 | 42 | | Navy, the Marine Corps prepares for counterinsurgency, guerilla, |
---|
43 | 43 | | and amphibious warfare and commando operations; and |
---|
44 | 44 | | WHEREAS, The U.S. Air Force, which became a separate branch |
---|
45 | 45 | | within the Department of Defense on September 18, 1947, had its |
---|
46 | 46 | | genesis in the 1907 creation of an aeronautical division within the |
---|
47 | 47 | | U.S. Army Signal Corps; military aviation subsequently achieved |
---|
48 | 48 | | widespread recognition during World War I, when planes proved their |
---|
49 | 49 | | effectiveness in reconnaissance and bombing missions, and air power |
---|
50 | 50 | | became a crucial factor in World War II, during which time the U.S. |
---|
51 | 51 | | Army Air Forces emerged as the most powerful air force in the world; |
---|
52 | 52 | | today's air force defends the country in the realms of air, space, |
---|
53 | 53 | | and cyberspace; and |
---|
54 | 54 | | WHEREAS, Now part of the Department of Homeland Security, the |
---|
55 | 55 | | U.S. Coast Guard has assumed many duties throughout its history, |
---|
56 | 56 | | from protecting against pirates to intercepting contraband, |
---|
57 | 57 | | conducting search and rescue operations, responding to oil spills, |
---|
58 | 58 | | and licensing and certifying all U.S. maritime personnel; its |
---|
59 | 59 | | wide-ranging wartime service has included escort and patrol duty |
---|
60 | 60 | | and assisting amphibious landings; and |
---|
61 | 61 | | WHEREAS, Together with members of the reserve forces, the |
---|
62 | 62 | | Army National Guard, and the Air National Guard, America's active |
---|
63 | 63 | | duty servicemen and servicewomen are committed to maintaining the |
---|
64 | 64 | | nation's security and are prepared to do their utmost in defense of |
---|
65 | 65 | | their country and the cause of freedom; now, therefore, be it |
---|
66 | 66 | | RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas |
---|
67 | 67 | | Legislature hereby recognize May 16, 2009, as Armed Forces Day and |
---|
68 | 68 | | extend to all the members of the nation's military profound |
---|
69 | 69 | | appreciation for their steadfast and courageous efforts in our |
---|
70 | 70 | | country's behalf. |
---|
71 | 71 | | Gattis |
---|
72 | 72 | | ______________________________ |
---|
73 | 73 | | Speaker of the House |
---|
74 | 74 | | I certify that H.R. No. 918 was adopted by the House on May |
---|
75 | 75 | | 14, 2009, by a non-record vote. |
---|
76 | 76 | | ______________________________ |
---|
77 | 77 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|