House | 03/27/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 924 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 924 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 859 | |
House | 03/20/2009 | Filed |