E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
05/28/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4208
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4093
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3149
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3149
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3149
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3080
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2683
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1046
|
Journal Page: 4257
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4257
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 4257
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4257
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4203
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
19-Herrero
|
Journal Page: 4203
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amended
|
18-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 4202
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
14-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 4186
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
16-Veasey
|
Journal Page: 4186
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
15-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 4185
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
14-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 4185
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 4163
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4160
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1567
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1098
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1098
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1098
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1098
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1097
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1097
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 1097
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1097
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1097
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1097
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1097
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 473
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 473
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|