Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1066 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1066
 (In the Senate - Filed February 23, 2009; March 13, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 30, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to posttrial psychological counseling for jurors in a
 criminal trial or juvenile adjudication hearing involving graphic
 evidence or testimony.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (f), Article 56.04, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 (f) The commissioners court may approve a program in which
 the crime victim liaison or victim assistance coordinator may offer
 not more than 10 hours of posttrial psychological counseling for a
 person who serves as a juror or an alternate juror in a criminal
 [the] trial [of an offense under Section 19.02, 19.03, 21.11,
 22.011, 22.021, 43.05, 43.25, or 43.251, Penal Code,] involving
 graphic evidence or testimony and who requests the posttrial
 psychological counseling not later than the 180th day after the
 date on which the jury in the trial is dismissed. The crime victim
 liaison or victim assistance coordinator may provide the counseling
 using a provider that assists local criminal justice agencies in
 providing similar services to victims.
 SECTION 2. The heading to Section 57.003, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 57.003. DUTIES [DUTY] OF JUVENILE BOARD AND VICTIM
 ASSISTANCE COORDINATOR.
 SECTION 3. Section 57.003, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  The juvenile board may approve a program in which the
 victim assistance coordinator may offer not more than 10 hours of
 posttrial psychological counseling for a person who serves as a
 juror or an alternate juror in an adjudication hearing involving
 graphic evidence or testimony and who requests the posttrial
 psychological counseling not later than the 180th day after the
 date on which the jury in the adjudication hearing is dismissed.
 The victim assistance coordinator may provide the counseling using
 a provider that assists local juvenile justice agencies in
 providing similar services to victims.
 SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a criminal trial or juvenile adjudication hearing for which a
 jury is selected on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 criminal trial or juvenile adjudication hearing for which a jury is
 selected before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law as it existed immediately before that date, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *