E
|
05/27/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4093
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2534
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3951
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2316
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB2671
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 1267
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1267
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 483
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 483
|
Senate
|
02/24/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|